+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 635, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3079.).
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2620.).
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 13).
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22).
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.)
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 14).
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 10, 2015: AB 921 JONES Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
September 9, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB921 Jones By Nielsen
- Yeas: 40
July 13, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 22, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 14, 2015: AB 921 JONES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 14, 2015: AB 921 JONES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor