+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 811, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3509.).
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2815.).
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1821.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 12, 2019: AB 919 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
September 11, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB919 Petrie-Norris et al. By Hill
- Yeas: 40
August 12, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 3, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2019: AB 919 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2019: Noes:
- Yeas: 18
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 23, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15