+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 845, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 3377.).
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2754.).
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 1964.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 26).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 14, 2017: AB 918 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 6
September 12, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB918 Bonta et al. By Lara
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
September 12, 2017: 1
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
September 1, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 28, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 12, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 31, 2017: AB 918 BONTA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 8
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
April 5, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor