+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 58, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1545.).
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17).
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1440.)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 6).
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 22, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB915 Holden By Monning
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
May 14, 2015: AB 915 HOLDEN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
May 6, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor