+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3141.).
On September 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2561.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1946.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
On May 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 9, 2019: AB 914 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 5, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB914 Holden By Skinner
- Yeas: 40
July 8, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 19, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
May 23, 2019: AB 914 Holden Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
April 9, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor