+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 318, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3098.).
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2340.).
On August 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Measure version as amended on July 5 corrected.
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 1980.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 26).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 11, 2017: AB 910 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 31, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB910 Ridley-Thomas By Nguyen
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 11, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2017: AB 910 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 12
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor