+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 713, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2324.).
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20).
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 1534.)
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 10).
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
August 31, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB901 Gloria et al. By Atkins
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
May 15, 2017: AB 901 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 1
May 10, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor