+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 694, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 2912.).
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2398.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 23. Page 1784.)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28).
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 4, 2015: AB 900 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
September 2, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB900 Levine By Lara
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 11
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
July 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: AB 900 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
April 28, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor