+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 686, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2860.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.)
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2412.).
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1910.)
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On January 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On January 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 3, 2015: AB 90 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
September 2, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB90 Chau By Beall
- Yeas: 40
July 13, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 30, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 30, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 4, 2015: AB 90 CHAU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 80
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 15, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 15, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor