+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 695, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 3391.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2852.).
On September 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11).
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 36. Page 2070.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1775.)
- Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Page 1755.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (May 26).
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On January 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
On January 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 14, 2017: AB 90 Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 5
September 13, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB90 Weber et al. By Mitchell
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
September 1, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 21, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 1, 2017: AB 90 WEBER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 36
- Present/NV: 2
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor