+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (33)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 5895.)
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On July 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 27).
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 1615.)
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 9).
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 16, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 6, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 18, 2017: AB 893 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 13
May 9, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor