+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 447, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3523.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2938.).
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1830.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
- Coauthors revised.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
September 15, 2017: AB 891 Mayes Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
September 14, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB891 Mayes et al. By Glazer Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 40
May 30, 2017: AB 891 GARCIA, E. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
March 21, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7