+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3102.).
On September 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2493.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1819.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
On March 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 9, 2019: AB 885 Irwin Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 4, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB885 Irwin et al. By Dodd
- Yeas: 40
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 12, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2019: AB 885 Irwin Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 8, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor