+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 30, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On June 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1611.).
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 721.)
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Nazarian. To Third Reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 15).
On January 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On January 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
On January 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 19, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd AB88
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
June 13, 2017: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
March 23, 2017: AB 88 NAZARIAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
March 15, 2017: 4
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 4
March 15, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor