+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
April 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor