+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 593, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2147.).
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E.Q.
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 1871.)
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 24, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB876 McCarty By Wolk
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 14
July 1, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 3, 2015: AB 876 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 13, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 13, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor