+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1818.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2019: AB 875 Wicks Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 24, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor