+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6188.).
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5116.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 1783.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
August 24, 2016: AB 874 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
August 18, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB874 Santiago By Jackson
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 25, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
June 2, 2015: AB 874 RENDON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 3
May 28, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor