+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3242.)
- (pending re-refer to com. on JUD.)
On January 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.