+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Died on inactive file.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1363.)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 1337.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1396.)
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1314.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.)
- Ordered to second reading.
- (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
On January 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
May 13, 2013: AB 87 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (15)
Committee on Budget
Type:
Primary Sponsor