+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 1796.)
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24).
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and E.S. & T.M.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
May 30, 2017: AB 869 RUBIO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
May 24, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: No Votes Recorded: Bigelow
- Yeas: 14
April 4, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor