+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 201, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2676.).
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2023.).
On July 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1489.)
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 21, 2017: AB 866 CUNNINGHAM Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
July 13, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd AB866
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 27, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 11, 2017: AB 866 CUNNINGHAM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 3, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11