+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On March 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on AGRI.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
April 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor