+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 48, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
On June 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 2040.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2039.)
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 1372.).
- Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 1372.)
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1372.)
- Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1363.)
- (Ayes 24. Noes 6. Page 1361.)
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1395.)
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1314.)
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.)
- Ordered to second reading.
- (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.)
- Withdrawn from committee.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On January 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
On January 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 15, 2013: AB 86 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BLUMENFIELD
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
June 14, 2013: Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB86 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) Amend by Wyland Lay on Table
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
May 13, 2013: AB 86 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (15)
Committee on Budget
Type:
Primary Sponsor