+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Vote
April 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor