+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 809, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3156.).
On September 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 7. Page 2570.).
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and B., P. & E.D.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1590.)
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and B. & P.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 9, 2019: AB 858 Levine Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
September 5, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB858 Levine By McGuire
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
July 8, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
June 18, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2019: AB 858 Levine Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
April 23, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 20
April 10, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor