+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 14.).
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 5203.).
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to second reading.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Durazo.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 21. Page 1328.)
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 21).
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2022: AB 857 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 10
August 29, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB857 Kalra et al. By Durazo
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
July 13, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 7, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 6, 2021: AB 857 Kalra Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 14
April 21, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor