+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On October 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 2978.).
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2108.).
On August 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 1514.)
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8).
On April 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On March 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 6, 2013: AB 855 BROWN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 2
September 3, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB855 Brown By Beall
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
June 10, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
May 20, 2013: AB 855 BROWN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 5
May 8, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 24, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor