+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 781, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 854.).
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2611.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 15).
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1756.)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22).
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 10, 2015: AB 854 WEBER Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 80
September 9, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB854 Weber By Mitchell Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 9, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB854 Weber By Mitchell Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 24, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: AB 854 WEBER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 17
April 22, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 22, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor