+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1607.).
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5).
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1077.)
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2).
On March 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On March 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 17, 2019: Consent Calendar AB853
- Yeas: 40
June 5, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 8, 2019: AB 853 Smith Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
April 2, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor