+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 304, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2676.).
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2202.).
On August 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1550.)
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
On May 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2015: AB 851 MAYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 27, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB851 Mayes By Beall
- Yeas: 40
June 24, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 22, 2015: AB 851 MAYES Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
May 13, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor