+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 705, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2648.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2228.).
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1655.)
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and L. GOV.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 1, 2021: AB 850 Gallagher Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB850 Gallagher et al. By Archuleta
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
May 27, 2021: AB 850 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
May 19, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
April 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor