+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor