+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On March 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor