+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2021.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.)
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 20. Page 2738.).
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 2296.).
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 8).
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 18. Page 1357.)
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 28).
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
September 2, 2021: AB 838 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 8
September 1, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB838 Friedman et al. By Durazo
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 4
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 8, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 10, 2021: AB 838 Friedman Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 15
April 28, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor