+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7:30 p.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 27, Statutes of 2021.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
- Article IV, Section 8(b) of the Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1657.)
- Joint and Senate Rules suspended.
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1659.).
On June 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass with recommendation: That the Floor amendments be adopted.
- (Ayes 8. Noes 3.)
- Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 2113.)
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 2116.)
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 2117.).
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Bill and proposed amendments
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
- Pursuant to Assembly Rule 56.1, file notice requirements waived.
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 78 suspended. (Page 2093.)
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to third reading.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bloom.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1542.)
On May 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 5).
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 28, 2021: AB 832 CHIU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
June 28, 2021: Assembly 2nd Reading AB832 Chiu et al. By Caballero Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 28, 2021: Do pass with recommendation: That the Floor amendments be adopted.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
May 5, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 8
April 15, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 8