+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Reconsideration granted. (Page 1582.)
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 27. Noes 32. Page 1454.).
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 29).
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 7).
On March 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
On February 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
May 14, 2015: AB 832 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 21
April 29, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 7, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor