+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 376, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3118.).
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (September 10).
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3087.)
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2533.).
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On August 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1757.)
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2021: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
September 10, 2021: AB 830 Flora Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB830 Flora By Roth
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
July 12, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
June 1, 2021: AB 830 Flora Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 79
May 5, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
April 27, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor