+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed passage.
- In committee:
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jackson.
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 7).
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 1339.)
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 30).
On April 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On April 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
On April 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On January 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
On January 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 24, 2016: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading.
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
July 7, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 7, 2015: AB 83 GATTO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 10
April 30, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor