+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 15, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6:30 p.m.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 4969.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 4954.)
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 3859.).
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (June 24).
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 12).
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1169.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.)
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 26, 2020: AB 83 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
June 25, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB83 BUDGET (Ting)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 6
June 12, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 11, 2019: AB 83 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor