+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On October 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 528, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2994.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2493.).
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1650.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Coauthors revised.
On April 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
On February 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (9)
September 9, 2021: AB 829 Levine Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
September 8, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB829 Levine et al. By Hurtado
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 13, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 22, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
May 27, 2021: AB 829 Levine Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 10
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor