+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 1994.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 26).
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 28).
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On March 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 17, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 26, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
May 31, 2017: AB 827 RUBIO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6
May 26, 2017: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
March 28, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor