+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1326.)
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 9, 2013: AB 820 HALL Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
May 1, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 10, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor