+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 590, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2653.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2238.).
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1717.) (June 29).
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1409.)
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
- Coauthors revised.
On April 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
September 1, 2021: AB 818 Bloom Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 30, 2021: Consent Calendar AB818
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 14, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 13, 2021: AB 818 Bloom Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
May 5, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
April 13, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
April 7, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor