+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 668, Statutes of 2021.
On September 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3008.).
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2489.).
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 30).
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1856.)
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On April 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
September 9, 2021: AB 815 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 8, 2021: Special Consent AB815
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 16, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 30, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2021: AB 815 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
March 24, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7