+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On September 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jackson.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2532.)
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 18. Page 2531.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 873.)
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (March 21).
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 6, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB814 Bloom et al. By Jackson Reconsider
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
September 6, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB814 Bloom et al. By Jackson
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
September 1, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 26, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 13, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 3, 2017: AB 814 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 9
March 21, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor