+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 112, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:40 p.m.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1692.).
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1343.)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9).
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On March 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 8, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB813 Melendez By Torres
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 5
June 4, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2013: AB 813 MELENDEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
May 1, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 9, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor