+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 3133.).
On September 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2559.).
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 11).
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1963.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
On February 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 11, 2017: AB 805 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 5
September 7, 2017: Assembly 3rd Reading AB805 Gonzalez Fletcher By Atkins
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
September 1, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 28, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 11, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
July 5, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 31, 2017: AB 805 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 5
May 26, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 24, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
April 19, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor