+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 9, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 4047.).
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2782.).
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Held at Desk.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to the Senate.
- Reconsideration granted. (Page 3499.)
On September 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Gordon.
- Assembly refused to concur in Senate amendments. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 3375.)
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2397.).
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2385.).
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Lieu.
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2385.)
On August 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 1839.)
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8).
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23).
On April 16, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
On March 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
March 10, 2014: AB 800 GORDON Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 7
February 20, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB800 Gordon By Lieu Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
September 13, 2013: AB 800 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 3
September 11, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB800 Gordon By Lieu
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
September 11, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB800 Gordon By Lieu Reconsider
- Yeas: 39
July 2, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
May 30, 2013: AB 800 GORDON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 3
May 8, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 23, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor