+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2021.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 1176.)
- Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1180.).
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On April 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On April 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after April 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (February 18).
- Measure version as amended on February 17 corrected.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 26).
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On January 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 13. Page 160.)
On January 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Without reference to committee.
- Ordered to second reading.
- (Ayes 46. Noes 13. Page 108.)
On December 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (5)
April 26, 2021: AB 80 BURKE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 3
April 26, 2021: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 19, 2021: Assembly 3rd Reading AB80 Burke et al. By Skinner Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
January 26, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 7
January 15, 2021: AB 80 Ting Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 19
+ − Sponsors (70)
Type:
Primary Sponsor